Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR3 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/15/2019

                            S.C.R. No. 3


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 BE IT RESOLVED by the 86th Legislature, That a joint
 committee, composed of six members of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor and six members of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house, arrange for the canvass of
 the votes cast for governor and lieutenant governor at the general
 election held on November 6, 2018, and that a joint session of the
 senate and house be held in the hall of the house of representatives
 at 12 noon on Thursday, January 10, 2019, for the purpose of
 counting the votes, receiving the report, and hearing the
 declaration of the results of the canvass; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the senate and house of representatives sit in
 joint session at 11 a.m. on Tuesday, January 15, 2019, for the
 inauguration of the governor-elect and lieutenant governor-elect
 of Texas as determined by the canvass of the votes; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That a joint committee, composed of five members of
 the senate appointed by the lieutenant governor and five members of
 the house of representatives appointed by the speaker of the house,
 make arrangements for the joint session and oath-taking ceremony on
 January 15, 2019; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the Department of Public Safety of the State
 of Texas is instructed to close all vehicle entrances to the Capitol
 grounds beginning at 5 p.m. on Monday, January 14, 2019, and ending
 at 11:59 p.m. on Tuesday, January 15, 2019, except for those
 vehicles approved by the inaugural committee as necessary for use
 in connection with the joint session and oath-taking ceremony and
 the program following.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 3 was adopted by the Senate
 on January 8, 2019, by a viva-voce vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 3 was adopted by the House
 on January 9, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 0,
 one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor