Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR74 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+86R3250 CJC-D
12 By: Creighton S.J.R. No. 74
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Property Tax;
4- April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
5- Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
73
84
9- SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
5+ A JOINT RESOLUTION
106 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
117 to exempt from ad valorem taxation real property leased to certain
128 schools organized and operated primarily for the purpose of
139 engaging in educational functions.
1410 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1511 SECTION 1. Section 2(a), Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
1612 is amended to read as follows:
1713 (a) All occupation taxes shall be equal and uniform upon the
1814 same class of subjects within the limits of the authority levying
1915 the tax; but the legislature may, by general laws, exempt from
2016 taxation public property used for public purposes; actual places of
2117 religious worship, also any property owned by a church or by a
2218 strictly religious society for the exclusive use as a dwelling
2319 place for the ministry of such church or religious society, and
2420 which yields no revenue whatever to such church or religious
2521 society; provided that such exemption shall not extend to more
2622 property than is reasonably necessary for a dwelling place and in no
2723 event more than one acre of land; any property owned by a church or
2824 by a strictly religious society that owns an actual place of
2925 religious worship if the property is owned for the purpose of
3026 expansion of the place of religious worship or construction of a new
3127 place of religious worship and the property yields no revenue
3228 whatever to the church or religious society, provided that the
3329 legislature by general law may provide eligibility limitations for
3430 the exemption and may impose sanctions related to the exemption in
3531 furtherance of the taxation policy of this subsection; any property
3632 that is owned by a church or by a strictly religious society and is
3733 leased by that church or strictly religious society to a person for
3834 use as a school, as defined by Section 11.21, Tax Code, or a
3935 successor statute, for educational purposes; any real property that
4036 is leased to a person for use as a school that operates under a
4137 charter granted by the State Board of Education, the commissioner
4238 of education, or any other state agency or officer and that is
4339 qualified as provided by Section 11.21, Tax Code, or a successor
4440 statute; places of burial not held for private or corporate profit;
4541 solar or wind-powered energy devices; all buildings used
4642 exclusively and owned by persons or associations of persons for
4743 school purposes and the necessary furniture of all schools and
4844 property used exclusively and reasonably necessary in conducting
4945 any association engaged in promoting the religious, educational and
5046 physical development of boys, girls, young men or young women
5147 operating under a State or National organization of like character;
5248 also the endowment funds of such institutions of learning and
5349 religion not used with a view to profit; and when the same are
5450 invested in bonds or mortgages, or in land or other property which
5551 has been and shall hereafter be bought in by such institutions under
5652 foreclosure sales made to satisfy or protect such bonds or
5753 mortgages, that such exemption of such land and property shall
5854 continue only for two years after the purchase of the same at such
5955 sale by such institutions and no longer, and institutions engaged
6056 primarily in public charitable functions, which may conduct
6157 auxiliary activities to support those charitable functions; and all
6258 laws exempting property from taxation other than the property
6359 mentioned in this Section shall be null and void.
6460 SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to
6561 the Texas Constitution:
6662 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
6763 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 86th Legislature,
6864 Regular Session, 2019, authorizing the legislature to exempt from
6965 ad valorem taxation real property leased to certain schools
7066 organized and operated primarily for the purpose of engaging in
7167 educational functions.
7268 (b) The amendment to Section 2(a), Article VIII, of this
7369 constitution takes effect beginning with the tax year that begins
7470 January 1, 2020.
7571 (c) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2021.
7672 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
7773 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
7874 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
7975 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
8076 legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation real property leased
8177 to certain schools organized and operated primarily for the purpose
8278 of engaging in educational functions."
83- * * * * *