Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR74 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/29/2019

                            By: Creighton S.J.R. No. 74
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 21, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Property Tax;
 April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
 to exempt from ad valorem taxation real property leased to certain
 schools organized and operated primarily for the purpose of
 engaging in educational functions.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2(a), Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  All occupation taxes shall be equal and uniform upon the
 same class of subjects within the limits of the authority levying
 the tax; but the legislature may, by general laws, exempt from
 taxation public property used for public purposes; actual places of
 religious worship, also any property owned by a church or by a
 strictly religious society for the exclusive use as a dwelling
 place for the ministry of such church or religious society, and
 which yields no revenue whatever to such church or religious
 society; provided that such exemption shall not extend to more
 property than is reasonably necessary for a dwelling place and in no
 event more than one acre of land; any property owned by a church or
 by a strictly religious society that owns an actual place of
 religious worship if the property is owned for the purpose of
 expansion of the place of religious worship or construction of a new
 place of religious worship and the property yields no revenue
 whatever to the church or religious society, provided that the
 legislature by general law may provide eligibility limitations for
 the exemption and may impose sanctions related to the exemption in
 furtherance of the taxation policy of this subsection; any property
 that is owned by a church or by a strictly religious society and is
 leased by that church or strictly religious society to a person for
 use as a school, as defined by Section 11.21, Tax Code, or a
 successor statute, for educational purposes; any real property that
 is leased to a person for use as a school that operates under a
 charter granted by the State Board of Education, the commissioner
 of education, or any other state agency or officer and that is
 qualified as provided by Section 11.21, Tax Code, or a successor
 statute; places of burial not held for private or corporate profit;
 solar or wind-powered energy devices; all buildings used
 exclusively and owned by persons or associations of persons for
 school purposes and the necessary furniture of all schools and
 property used exclusively and reasonably necessary in conducting
 any association engaged in promoting the religious, educational and
 physical development of boys, girls, young men or young women
 operating under a State or National organization of like character;
 also the endowment funds of such institutions of learning and
 religion not used with a view to profit; and when the same are
 invested in bonds or mortgages, or in land or other property which
 has been and shall hereafter be bought in by such institutions under
 foreclosure sales made to satisfy or protect such bonds or
 mortgages, that such exemption of such land and property shall
 continue only for two years after the purchase of the same at such
 sale by such institutions and no longer, and institutions engaged
 primarily in public charitable functions, which may conduct
 auxiliary activities to support those charitable functions; and all
 laws exempting property from taxation other than the property
 mentioned in this Section shall be null and void.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 86th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2019, authorizing the legislature to exempt from
 ad valorem taxation real property leased to certain schools
 organized and operated primarily for the purpose of engaging in
 educational functions.
 (b)  The amendment to Section 2(a), Article VIII, of this
 constitution takes effect beginning with the tax year that begins
 January 1, 2020.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation real property leased
 to certain schools organized and operated primarily for the purpose
 of engaging in educational functions."
 * * * * *