Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR14 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/16/2019

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 14
 In Memory
 of
 Herbert David Kelleher
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Herbert David Kelleher, who died
 January 3, 2019, at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, Herb Kelleher was a treasured Texas citizen with a
 larger-than-life personality; he was also a savvy entrepreneur
 whose foresight, shrewd business sense, and flair for unique and
 engaging marketing strategies helped launch an airline that
 revolutionized air travel in the United States; and
 WHEREAS, Herb Kelleher was born on March 12, 1931, in
 Camden, New Jersey; he graduated from Haddon Heights High School
 in Audubon and earned a degree from Wesleyan University, where he
 was an Olin Scholar; he earned his law degree from New York
 University, and he practiced law on the East Coast for a time
 before moving to Texas to establish his own law firm; and
 WHEREAS, In 1967, Mr. Kelleher and his client, Rollin King,
 created Air Southwest, Incorporated, with the idea of
 instituting low-fare airline service within Texas; after a name
 change and numerous legal battles, Southwest Airlines began
 service on June 18, 1971; Herb served as the company's legal
 counsel, and later, as its president, chief executive officer,
 and chairman; and
 WHEREAS, Due to Herb's vision and leadership, Southwest
 Airlines grew from a carrier with only three airplanes to become
 one of the largest airlines in the country; by 2008, the airline
 operated with a fleet of more than 500 airplanes that completed
 more than 3,400 flights each day; between 1972 and 2002, the
 company produced the highest return to shareholders of any
 company listed in the Standard and Poor's 500 during that
 period; and
 WHEREAS, Herb Kelleher became the public face of the
 airline through his colorful appearances at events and on a
 variety of television commercials; he played a major role in
 cultivating the company's stimulating and friendly work
 environment and was beloved by the airline's employees, and in
 1998, Fortune magazine named Southwest Airlines the Best Place to
 Work in America; it remains the only airline named to the
 magazine's top 10 list of the World's Most Admired Companies; and
 WHEREAS, Herb received countless awards over the course of
 his career and was inducted into the United States Chamber
 Business Leadership Hall of Fame and the National Aviation Hall
 of Fame; he stepped down as the airline's president and chief
 executive officer in 2001, and he retired as chairman in
 2008; and
 WHEREAS, He was a devoted husband to his wife of 64 years,
 Joan Negley Kelleher, a loving father to his four children,
 Michael Kelleher, Ruth Agather, David Kelleher, and the late
 Julie Stacey, and a doting grandfather to his nine grandchildren,
 and he leaves behind memories that will be treasured forever by
 all who were privileged to share in his life; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Herbert David Kelleher; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Herb Kelleher.
 West
 Alvarado Hinojosa Paxton Alvarado Hinojosa Paxton
Alvarado Hinojosa Paxton
 Bettencourt Huffman Perry Bettencourt Huffman Perry
Bettencourt Huffman Perry
 Birdwell Hughes Powell Birdwell Hughes Powell
Birdwell Hughes Powell
 Buckingham Johnson Rodríguez Buckingham Johnson Rodríguez
Buckingham Johnson Rodríguez
 Campbell Kolkhorst Schwertner Campbell Kolkhorst Schwertner
Campbell Kolkhorst Schwertner
 Creighton Lucio Seliger Creighton Lucio Seliger
Creighton Lucio Seliger
 Fallon Menéndez Taylor Fallon Menéndez Taylor
Fallon Menéndez Taylor
 Flores Miles Watson Flores Miles Watson
Flores Miles Watson
 Hall Nelson Whitmire Hall Nelson Whitmire
Hall Nelson Whitmire
 Hancock Nichols Zaffirini Hancock Nichols Zaffirini
Hancock Nichols Zaffirini
 Patrick, President of the Senate
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on January 16, 2019, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate

Alvarado Hinojosa Paxton

Bettencourt Huffman Perry

Birdwell Hughes Powell

Buckingham Johnson Rodríguez

Campbell Kolkhorst Schwertner

Creighton Lucio Seliger

Fallon Menéndez Taylor

Flores Miles Watson

Hall Nelson Whitmire

Hancock Nichols Zaffirini