Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR249 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/25/2019

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 249
 In Memory
 of
 Betty Ann Cox
 WHEREAS, Betty Ann Cox of Tyler, an inspiring educator and
 a deeply cherished wife, mother, grandmother, and friend, passed
 away on January 19, 2019, at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Denton on August 10, 1931, to Henry and
 Neva Riek, the former Betty Riek grew up with the companionship
 of a brother, Bob; on June 12, 1953, she was joined in matrimony
 to Dale Cox, with whom she shared 58 years of marriage before his
 passing; the couple raised two children, Greg and Deanie, and
 Mrs. Cox later experienced the joy of welcoming into her
 treasured family three grandchildren, Sarah, Brooke, and Peyton,
 and two great-grandchildren, Paxton and Addie; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Cox received her bachelor's degree from
 Hardin-Simmons University and her master's degree from Stephen
 F. Austin State University; she enjoyed a rewarding career with
 the Tyler Independent School District, where she served as a
 teacher, principal, and director of elementary education; she
 was renowned for the personal attention that she gave to her
 students, and she was respected greatly as a role model by those
 who worked alongside her; and
 WHEREAS, A woman of strong faith, Mrs. Cox was a member of
 the First Baptist Church of Tyler for 56 years, and she
 contributed to her congregation by teaching Sunday school,
 singing in the choir, and serving on committees; she was
 unstintingly generous with her time, and she was always a
 positive and encouraging influence on others; and
 WHEREAS, Betty Cox dedicated her life to her family, her
 faith, and her profession, and she made the world a brighter
 place for all who were fortunate enough to know her; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Betty Ann Cox and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family:  to her
 children, Greg Cox and his wife, Lala, and Deanie McDonough and
 her husband, Nick; to her grandchildren, Sarah Santone and her
 husband, Jonathon, Brooke Lowthorp and her husband, Nathan, and
 Peyton McDonough and his fiancée, Tina Hetherington; to her
 great-grandchildren, Paxton and Addie Santone; to her brother,
 Bob Riek, and his wife, Marlene; and to her many other relatives
 and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Betty Cox.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 25, 2019,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate