Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR265

Caption

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as Galveston County Day.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX HR427

Recognizing March 1, 2023, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR246

Recognizing March 1, 2023, as Galveston County Day.

TX HR108

Recognizing March 6, 2025, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR209

Recognizing March 6, 2025, as Galveston County Day.

TX HR1548

Recognizing March 30, 2015, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR677

Recognizing March 1, 2017, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR591

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR14

Recognizing Johnny Smecca for being named the Galvestonian of the Year for 2014.