Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR445 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/20/2019

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 445
 In Memory
 of
 Baker Pattillo
 WHEREAS, The passing of Dr. Baker Pattillo of Nacogdoches
 on December 29, 2018, at the age of 75, brought great sorrow to
 his family and friends, as well as to the campus community of
 Stephen F. Austin State University, which he served with great
 distinction for more than five decades; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Camden on June 22, 1943, Baker Pattillo
 was the son of the Reverend Leroy Pattillo and Mauree Pattillo;
 he moved with his family to Arp in 1956 and lettered as a member
 of the Tigers football team at Arp High School, where his
 classmates voted him "most likely to succeed"; he subsequently
 put himself through college; after studying first at Tyler Junior
 College, he earned his bachelor's degree in 1965 and his master's
 degree in guidance and counseling in 1966 from Stephen F. Austin
 State University; he later completed a doctoral degree in
 educational administration at Texas A&M University; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Pattillo was hired as assistant director of
 placement and financial aid at Stephen F. Austin State University
 in 1966; he was promoted to dean of student services in 1972 and
 to vice president for student affairs in 1979; after being
 appointed interim president in July 2006, he assumed the office
 of president in January 2007; and
 WHEREAS, Over the course of his 11-year tenure as
 president, Dr. Pattillo coordinated campus projects that totaled
 more than $425 million, including a student recreation center, a
 nursing building, and three residential buildings; moreover, he
 took well-deserved pride in securing $150 million in funding for
 four additional facilities during his last day of work; under his
 leadership, the university exceeded 13,000 in enrollment,
 surpassing its previous record, and Dr. Pattillo enjoyed a strong
 rapport with students, as well as with faculty, staff, regents,
 and state and national leaders; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Pattillo shared 52 years of marriage with his
 wife, Janice Pattillo, whom he wed on December 17, 1966, and they
 were blessed with a daughter, Paige, a grandson, Jackson, and a
 son-in-law, Todd; and
 WHEREAS, Through his vision and leadership, Dr. Baker
 Pattillo contributed immeasurably to advancing the mission of
 Stephen F. Austin State University, and he leaves behind a legacy
 that will continue to resonate for years to come; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Dr. Baker Pattillo
 and extend deepest condolences to his relatives and many friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Dr. Baker Pattillo.
 Nichols
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 20, 2019, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate