Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR513 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/01/2019

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 513
 In Memory
 of
 Jacob Alexander Graves
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Jacob Alexander "Jake" Graves, who died
 April 12, 2018, at the age of 32; and
 WHEREAS, Jake Graves was an exemplary citizen who was
 respected and admired in his community for his service and his
 many achievements; and
 WHEREAS, He was born May 10, 1985, in Midland, to Mark and
 Kim Graves; he graduated from the San Marcos Baptist Academy in
 2003; and
 WHEREAS, He served the nation with distinction in the
 United States Army with the 1st Cavalry Division as an
 infantryman and cannon crewmember in Iraq; his many awards and
 commendations included the Army Commendation Medal and the
 National Defense Service Medal; and
 WHEREAS, He and his beloved wife, Jessica Graves, married
 on November 1, 2014; the members of his large and loving extended
 family were a source of much pride and joy for him; and
 WHEREAS, A man of courage, strength, and kindness, he gave
 unselfishly to others, and his generous spirit and his enthusiasm
 for living each day to the fullest will not be forgotten; and
 WHEREAS, He was a devoted husband, son, and brother, and he
 leaves behind memories that will be treasured forever by his
 family and many friends; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Jacob Alexander Graves; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Jake Graves.
 Campbell
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 1, 2019, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate