Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR576 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/15/2019

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 576
 In Memory
 of
 Garnett Shelton Grant Sr.
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life well lived may help to comfort
 those saddened by the passing of Garnett Shelton Grant Sr. of
 Gatesville on December 31, 2018, at the age of 82; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Ed and Nell Grant, Garnett Grant was
 born in Tarrant County on January 9, 1936, and he was raised with
 five siblings, Don, Mike, Ed, George, and Nellie; he graduated
 from Northwest High School in 1954 and answered his nation's call
 to duty by serving in the United States Army; on July 20, 1957, he
 married the former Nancy Page, and they shared a rewarding union
 of nearly 50 years until her death in 2006; he was a devoted
 father to their three children, Shelton, Kathy, and Michael, and
 he also experienced the joy of welcoming into his cherished
 family four grandchildren, Chris, Mike, Jana, and Kate, and two
 great-grandchildren, Aria and Lyric; and
 WHEREAS, After earning a bachelor's degree in business
 administration from Texas Wesleyan College in 1962, Mr. Grant
 taught at Westminster and Gatesville High Schools and the
 Gatesville State School for Boys; in 1967, he and his wife
 purchased a hamburger restaurant they called the Snak Shak; the
 eatery quickly grew to become a favorite meeting spot among
 Gatesville residents, and it was later renamed Grant's; driven by
 his entrepreneurial spirit, Mr. Grant went on to expand his
 business ventures to include additional restaurants as well as a
 number of commercial and residential real estate development
 projects; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Grant was dedicated to serving his community,
 and he frequently offered the use of his properties for public
 events, especially those benefiting young people; he took an
 interest in politics and history, and he also loved to travel,
 both within the United States and abroad; his life was further
 enriched by the special relationship he shared with Beverly
 Lovejoy Boyd; and
 WHEREAS, Garnett Grant lived a life that was rich in
 personal and professional achievements, and he will forever be a
 source of inspiration to those he leaves behind; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Garnett Shelton
 Grant Sr. and extend heartfelt sympathy to his relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Garnett Shelton Grant Sr.
 Hughes, Buckingham
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 15, 2019, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate