Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR812 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/23/2019

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 812
 In Memory
 of
 Wendell Howard
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Wendell Howard who died March 15, 2019,
 at the age of 80; and
 WHEREAS, Born to Margie and Howell Howard on April 6, 1938,
 Wendell Howard lived in Lubbock for much of his childhood, and
 the family moved to Abernathy, Texas, during his junior high
 school years; and
 WHEREAS, Wendell graduated from Texas Tech University in
 1961, and he went on to build a rewarding career serving the
 domestic and international seed industry for 60 years; he took
 great joy in his profession, and he developed lifelong
 friendships with colleagues in the industry whom he met around
 the globe; he served in numerous volunteer leadership positions,
 and he was honored by the American Seed Trade Association and the
 Southern Seedsmen Association for his many contributions to the
 industry; and
 WHEREAS, Wendell married the love of his life, Sandy, on
 March 14, 1986; he was the devoted father of three children, and
 his five grandchildren and great-grandson enriched his life
 immeasurably; and
 WHEREAS, Known for his ready smile, his inquisitive
 nature, and his generous spirit, Wendell Howard engaged in life
 with joy and vigor; he was beloved by many, and he will long be
 remembered with respect and admiration by all who were privileged
 to share in his life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Wendell Howard; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Wendell Howard.
 Perry
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 23, 2019, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate