Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1016 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021