Senate | 05/17/2021 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/16/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Record vote RV#1171 | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Human Services | ||
House | 11/09/2020 | Filed |