Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1057 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis March 25, 2021