Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1105 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021