Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1135 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 2, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021