Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1147 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1147
1+By: Huberty, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 1147
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
3+ April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 10, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0;
6+ May 10, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1147 By: Taylor
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to military readiness for purposes of the indicators of
614 achievement under the public school accountability system and the
715 college, career, or military readiness outcomes bonus under the
816 Foundation School Program.
917 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1018 SECTION 1. Section 39.053(c), Education Code, is amended to
1119 read as follows:
1220 (c) School districts and campuses must be evaluated based on
1321 three domains of indicators of achievement adopted under this
1422 section that include:
1523 (1) in the student achievement domain, indicators of
1624 student achievement that must include:
1725 (A) for evaluating the performance of districts
1826 and campuses generally:
1927 (i) an indicator that accounts for the
2028 results of assessment instruments required under Sections
2129 39.023(a), (c), and (l), as applicable for the district and campus,
2230 including the results of assessment instruments required for
2331 graduation retaken by a student, aggregated across grade levels by
2432 subject area, including:
2533 (a) for the performance standard
2634 determined by the commissioner under Section 39.0241(a), the
2735 percentage of students who performed satisfactorily on the
2836 assessment instruments, aggregated across grade levels by subject
2937 area; and
3038 (b) for the college readiness
3139 performance standard as determined under Section 39.0241, the
3240 percentage of students who performed satisfactorily on the
3341 assessment instruments, aggregated across grade levels by subject
3442 area; and
3543 (ii) an indicator that accounts for the
3644 results of assessment instruments required under Section
3745 39.023(b), as applicable for the district and campus, including the
3846 percentage of students who performed satisfactorily on the
3947 assessment instruments, as determined by the performance standard
4048 adopted by the agency, aggregated across grade levels by subject
4149 area; and
4250 (B) for evaluating the performance of high school
4351 campuses and districts that include high school campuses,
4452 indicators that account for:
4553 (i) students who satisfy the Texas Success
4654 Initiative (TSI) college readiness benchmarks prescribed by the
4755 Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board under Section 51.334 on
4856 an assessment instrument in reading or mathematics designated by
4957 the coordinating board under that section;
5058 (ii) students who satisfy relevant
5159 performance standards on advanced placement tests or similar
5260 assessments;
5361 (iii) students who earn dual course credits
5462 in the dual credit courses;
5563 (iv) students who enlist in the armed
5664 forces of the United States or the Texas National Guard;
5765 (v) students who earn industry
5866 certifications;
5967 (vi) students admitted into postsecondary
6068 industry certification programs that require as a prerequisite for
6169 entrance successful performance at the secondary level;
6270 (vii) students whose successful completion
6371 of a course or courses under Section 28.014 indicates the student's
6472 preparation to enroll and succeed, without remediation, in an
6573 entry-level general education course for a baccalaureate degree or
6674 associate degree;
6775 (viii) students who successfully met
6876 standards on a composite of indicators that through research
6977 indicates the student's preparation to enroll and succeed, without
7078 remediation, in an entry-level general education course for a
7179 baccalaureate degree or associate degree;
7280 (ix) high school graduation rates, computed
7381 in accordance with standards and definitions adopted in compliance
7482 with the Every Student Succeeds Act (20 U.S.C. Section 6301 et seq.)
7583 subject to the exclusions provided by Subsections (g), (g-1),
7684 (g-2), and (g-3);
7785 (x) students who successfully completed an
7886 OnRamps dual enrollment course;
7987 (xi) students who successfully completed a
8088 practicum or internship approved by the State Board of Education;
8189 and
8290 (xii) students who are awarded an associate
8391 degree;
8492 (2) in the school progress domain, indicators for
8593 effectiveness in promoting student learning, which must include:
8694 (A) for assessment instruments, including
8795 assessment instruments under Subdivisions (1)(A)(i) and (ii), the
8896 percentage of students who met the standard for improvement, as
8997 determined by the commissioner; and
9098 (B) for evaluating relative performance, the
9199 performance of districts and campuses compared to similar districts
92100 or campuses; and
93101 (3) in the closing the gaps domain, the use of
94102 disaggregated data to demonstrate the differentials among students
95103 from different racial and ethnic groups, socioeconomic
96104 backgrounds, and other factors, including:
97105 (A) students formerly receiving special
98106 education services;
99107 (B) students continuously enrolled; and
100108 (C) students who are mobile.
101109 SECTION 2. Section 48.110(f), Education Code, is amended to
102110 read as follows:
103111 (f) For purposes of this section, an annual graduate
104112 demonstrates:
105113 (1) college readiness if the annual graduate:
106114 (A) achieves college readiness standards used
107115 for accountability purposes under Chapter 39 on the ACT, the SAT, or
108116 an assessment instrument designated by the Texas Higher Education
109117 Coordinating Board under Section 51.334; and
110118 (B) during a time period established by
111119 commissioner rule, enrolls at a postsecondary educational
112120 institution;
113121 (2) career readiness if the annual graduate:
114122 (A) achieves college readiness standards used
115123 for accountability purposes under Chapter 39 on the ACT, the SAT, or
116124 an assessment instrument designated by the Texas Higher Education
117125 Coordinating Board under Section 51.334; and
118126 (B) during a time period established by
119127 commissioner rule, earns an industry-accepted certificate; and
120128 (3) military readiness if the annual graduate:
121129 (A) achieves a passing score set by the
122130 applicable military branch on the Armed Services Vocational
123131 Aptitude Battery; and
124132 (B) during a time period established by
125133 commissioner rule, enlists in the armed forces of the United States
126134 or the Texas National Guard.
127135 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
128- ______________________________ ______________________________
129- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
130- I certify that H.B. No. 1147 was passed by the House on April
131- 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not
132- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
133- No. 1147 on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0,
134- 1 present, not voting.
135- ______________________________
136- Chief Clerk of the House
137- I certify that H.B. No. 1147 was passed by the Senate, with
138- amendments, on May 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
139- 0.
140- ______________________________
141- Secretary of the Senate
142- APPROVED: __________________
143- Date
144- __________________
145- Governor
136+ * * * * *