Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1147 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 8, 2021
Fiscal Note May 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021