Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1159 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Murr (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1159
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the maximum judgment amount awarded by a justice court
 in certain civil cases regarding the repair of residential rental
 property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 92.0563(e), Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (e)  A justice court may not award a judgment under this
 section, including an order of repair, that exceeds $20,000
 [$10,000], excluding interest and costs of court.
 SECTION 2.  Section 92.0563(e), Property Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a cause of action filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A cause of action filed before that date
 is governed by the law in effect immediately before that date, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *