Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1159 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021