Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1181 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2021

                    By: Middleton, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1181
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain counties to authorize the
 operation of a golf cart or off-highway vehicle on certain roads.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 551.404(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Subsection (b) applies only to a county that:
 (1)  borders or contains a portion of the Red River; or
 (2)  [borders or contains a portion of the Guadalupe
 River and contains a part of a barrier island that] borders the Gulf
 of Mexico and has a population of less than 500,000[; or
 [(3)  is adjacent to a county described by Subdivision
 (2) and:
 [(A)  has a population of less than 37,000; and
 [(B)  contains a part of a barrier island or
 peninsula that borders the Gulf of Mexico].
 SECTION 2.  Section 551A.053(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Subsection (b) applies only to a county that:
 (1)  borders or contains a portion of the Red River; or
 (2)  [borders or contains a portion of the Guadalupe
 River and contains a part of a barrier island that] borders the Gulf
 of Mexico and has a population of less than 500,000[; or
 [(3)  is adjacent to a county described by Subdivision
 (2) and:
 [(A)  has a population of less than 37,000; and
 [(B)  contains a part of a barrier island or
 peninsula that borders the Gulf of Mexico].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *