Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1181 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021