Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1190 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021