Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1239 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021