1 | | - | H.B. No. 1239 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Sanford, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 1239 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 10, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 10, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1239 By: Campbell |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the prohibited suspension of laws protecting religious |
---|
6 | 14 | | freedom and prohibited closure of places of worship. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 110.001(a), Civil Practice and Remedies |
---|
9 | 17 | | Code, is amended by adding Subdivisions (3) and (4) to read as |
---|
10 | 18 | | follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | (3) "Place of worship" means a building or grounds |
---|
12 | 20 | | where religious activities are conducted. |
---|
13 | 21 | | (4) "Public official" means any elected or appointed |
---|
14 | 22 | | officer, employee, or agent of this state or any political |
---|
15 | 23 | | subdivision, board, commission, bureau, or other public body |
---|
16 | 24 | | established by law. |
---|
17 | 25 | | SECTION 2. Section 110.002, Civil Practice and Remedies |
---|
18 | 26 | | Code, is amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows: |
---|
19 | 27 | | (d) For purposes of a state of disaster declared under |
---|
20 | 28 | | Chapter 418, Government Code: |
---|
21 | 29 | | (1) this chapter is not considered a regulatory |
---|
22 | 30 | | statute; and |
---|
23 | 31 | | (2) a provision of this chapter may not be suspended. |
---|
24 | 32 | | SECTION 3. Chapter 110, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, |
---|
25 | 33 | | is amended by adding Section 110.0031 to read as follows: |
---|
26 | 34 | | Sec. 110.0031. PROHIBITION ON ORDERS CLOSING PLACES OF |
---|
27 | 35 | | WORSHIP. A government agency or public official may not issue an |
---|
28 | 36 | | order that closes or has the effect of closing places of worship in |
---|
29 | 37 | | this state or in a geographic area of this state. |
---|
30 | 38 | | SECTION 4. Section 110.004, Civil Practice and Remedies |
---|
31 | 39 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
32 | 40 | | Sec. 110.004. DEFENSE. A person whose free exercise of |
---|
33 | 41 | | religion has been substantially burdened in violation of Section |
---|
34 | 42 | | 110.003 or 110.0031 may assert that violation as a defense in a |
---|
35 | 43 | | judicial or administrative proceeding without regard to whether the |
---|
36 | 44 | | proceeding is brought in the name of the state or by any other |
---|
37 | 45 | | person. |
---|
38 | 46 | | SECTION 5. Chapter 110, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, |
---|
39 | 47 | | as amended by this Act, applies only to a claim or defense that |
---|
40 | 48 | | accrues on or after the effective date of this Act. A claim or |
---|
41 | 49 | | defense that accrued before the effective date of this Act is |
---|
42 | 50 | | governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date |
---|
43 | 51 | | of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
44 | 52 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
45 | 53 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
46 | 54 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
47 | 55 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
48 | 56 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
51 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1239 was passed by the House on April |
---|
52 | | - | 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 122, Nays 22, 1 present, not |
---|
53 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
54 | | - | No. 1239 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 113, Nays 30, |
---|
55 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
58 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1239 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
59 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays |
---|
60 | | - | 3. |
---|
61 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
63 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Date |
---|
65 | | - | __________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 57 | + | * * * * * |
---|