Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note May 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021