Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1240 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1240
1+By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1240
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
3+ May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
4+ Government; May 19, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1240 By: Eckhardt
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the offense of failure to comply with an order from a
614 fire marshal and the authority of certain county employees to issue
715 citations for certain violations; changing a criminal penalty.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Section 352.022, Local Government Code, is
1018 amended to read as follows:
1119 Sec. 352.022. PENALTY FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER. (a)
1220 A person [An owner or occupant] who is subject to an order issued
1321 under Section 352.016 commits an offense if that person fails to
1422 comply with the order. Each refusal to comply is a separate
1523 offense.
1624 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), (d), or (e), an
1725 [The] offense under this section is a Class C [B] misdemeanor.
1826 (c) An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor
1927 if the commission of the offense results in bodily injury or death.
2028 (d) Unless Subsection (c) applies, if it is shown on the
2129 trial of the offense that the defendant has been previously
2230 convicted under this section, the offense is a Class B misdemeanor.
2331 (e) If [unless] it is shown on the trial of the offense that
2432 the defendant has been previously convicted two or more times under
2533 this section, [in which event] the offense is a state jail felony.
2634 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 352, Local Government
2735 Code, is amended by adding Section 352.0221 to read as follows:
2836 Sec. 352.0221. AUTHORITY OF CERTAIN COUNTY EMPLOYEES TO
2937 ISSUE CITATION. (a) This section applies only to:
3038 (1) a county with a population of 3.3 million or more;
3139 and
3240 (2) a county with a population of 550,000 or more
3341 adjacent to a county with a population of 3.3 million or more.
3442 (b) The commissioners court of a county to which this
3543 section applies may grant the authority to issue a citation under
3644 this section to a county employee who:
3745 (1) is certified by the Texas Commission on Fire
3846 Protection as a fire inspector;
3947 (2) conducts fire or life safety inspections under
4048 Section 352.016; and
4149 (3) is not a peace officer.
4250 (c) The employee may issue a citation in the unincorporated
4351 area of the county only for:
4452 (1) an offense under Section 352.022; or
4553 (2) a violation of an order relating to fire or life
4654 safety issued by the commissioners court that is reasonably
4755 necessary to protect public safety and welfare.
4856 (d) A citation issued under this section must state:
4957 (1) the name of the person cited;
5058 (2) the violation charged; and
5159 (3) the time and place the person is required to appear
5260 in court.
5361 (e) This section does not authorize the employee to arrest a
5462 person.
5563 (f) If a person who receives a citation under this section
5664 fails to appear in court on the return date of the citation, the
5765 court may issue a warrant for the person's arrest for the violation
5866 described in the citation.
5967 SECTION 3. Section 352.022, Local Government Code, as
6068 amended by this Act, applies only to an offense committed on or
6169 after the effective date of this Act. An offense committed before
6270 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on
6371 the date the offense was committed, and the former law is continued
6472 in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section, an
6573 offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if any
6674 element of the offense was committed before that date.
6775 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
68- ______________________________ ______________________________
69- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
70- I certify that H.B. No. 1240 was passed by the House on April
71- 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 111, Nays 35, 2 present, not
72- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
73- No. 1240 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 100, Nays 40,
74- 1 present, not voting.
75- ______________________________
76- Chief Clerk of the House
77- I certify that H.B. No. 1240 was passed by the Senate, with
78- amendments, on May 22, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays
79- 4.
80- ______________________________
81- Secretary of the Senate
82- APPROVED: __________________
83- Date
84- __________________
85- Governor
76+ * * * * *