Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1247 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021