Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1247 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1247
1+By: Lozano, Ordaz Perez H.B. No. 1247
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Powell, Alvarado, Hinojosa)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
4+ May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
5+ Resources & Economic Development; May 22, 2021, reported
6+ adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
7+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1247 By: Zaffirini
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to the development of and report on a tri-agency
615 work-based learning strategic framework by the Texas Workforce
716 Commission, the Texas Education Agency, and the Texas Higher
817 Education Coordinating Board.
918 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1019 SECTION 1. Subtitle B, Title 4, Labor Code, is amended by
1120 adding Chapter 318 to read as follows:
1221 CHAPTER 318. TRI-AGENCY WORK-BASED LEARNING STRATEGIC FRAMEWORK
1322 Sec. 318.001. TRI-AGENCY WORK-BASED LEARNING STRATEGIC
1423 FRAMEWORK. (a) The commission, the Texas Education Agency, and the
1524 Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board jointly shall develop a
1625 strategic framework to encourage work-based learning in this state.
1726 Each agency shall appoint an existing agency employee to lead the
1827 development of the framework.
1928 (b) Not later than December 31, 2022, the commission, the
2029 Texas Education Agency, and the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
2130 Board jointly shall prepare and submit to the legislature a report
2231 on the framework developed under Subsection (a). The report must:
2332 (1) define "work-based learning opportunity" in a
2433 comprehensive manner that includes a variety of high-quality and
2534 rigorous work-based learning opportunities, such as youth
2635 apprenticeships, internships, simulated workplaces, service
2736 learning, and virtual workspaces;
2837 (2) determine common language, definitions, and
2938 quality standards to be used by each agency for work-based learning
3039 opportunities that span secondary and postsecondary education;
3140 (3) establish methods of identifying student and adult
3241 learner skills and competencies that are aligned with industry
3342 demand and talent needs, with a particular focus on high-demand,
3443 high-growth industries that offer livable wages;
3544 (4) align priorities, programs, and goals across the
3645 agencies to ensure the development of cohesive work-based learning
3746 strategies that strengthen workforce pipelines;
3847 (5) identify strategies for the agencies to partner
3948 with public primary and secondary schools, public institutions of
4049 higher education, businesses, workforce organizations, and
4150 relevant collaboratives to implement high-quality project-based
4251 learning in middle and junior high school classrooms and work-based
4352 learning experiences in high school and postsecondary education;
4453 (6) provide methods of supporting partnerships
4554 between public institutions of higher education to create
4655 additional pathways for postsecondary work-based learning
4756 credentials of value to high-demand, high-growth industries and
4857 that lead to quality career opportunities;
4958 (7) articulate the roles and responsibilities of
5059 public primary and secondary schools, public institutions of higher
5160 education, and workforce boards and organizations in implementing
5261 high-quality work-based learning programs and partnerships;
5362 (8) provide a strategy for identifying industry-led
5463 high-quality training models that promote and replicate high-need
5564 jobs that lead to equitable outcomes for individuals and can be
5665 scaled across industries and regions;
5766 (9) identify opportunities to improve and incentivize
5867 regional coordination across the state to better reflect regional
5968 workforce needs and eliminate duplicative programs, including by
6069 providing state support to build capacity in regional intermediary
6170 organizations to facilitate education-workforce partnerships and
6271 programs;
6372 (10) identify streamlined data collection models for
6473 primary, secondary, and postsecondary education and workforce
6574 accountability that can be disaggregated as necessary to evaluate
6675 and increase equity in access to high-quality programs, with a
6776 focus on underrepresented populations;
6877 (11) include recommendations to improve the
6978 coordination of funds and awarding of grants among the agencies to
7079 eliminate barriers to entry for regional partners; and
7180 (12) identify any available federal funds that may be
7281 used for work-based learning and training and include
7382 recommendations regarding the use of those funds by the agencies,
7483 including supporting incentives for public institutions of higher
7584 education, work-study programs, and student advising and
7685 completion strategies.
7786 (c) As soon as practicable after the report is submitted,
7887 the commission, the Texas Education Agency, and the Texas Higher
7988 Education Coordinating Board shall, to the extent possible,
8089 implement the recommendations made under Subsection (b)(12).
8190 Sec. 318.002. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires September
8291 1, 2023.
8392 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
84- ______________________________ ______________________________
85- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
86- I certify that H.B. No. 1247 was passed by the House on April
87- 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 120, Nays 25, 2 present, not
88- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
89- No. 1247 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 114, Nays 32,
90- 1 present, not voting.
91- ______________________________
92- Chief Clerk of the House
93- I certify that H.B. No. 1247 was passed by the Senate, with
94- amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
95- 1.
96- ______________________________
97- Secretary of the Senate
98- APPROVED: __________________
99- Date
100- __________________
101- Governor
93+ * * * * *