Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1301 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1301
1+By: Guillen, Guerra, Morales of Maverick H.B. No. 1301
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
4+ May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
5+ Government; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
6+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
7+ May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1301 By: Menéndez
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to services provided by colonia self-help centers and a
615 study on colonias in this state.
716 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
817 SECTION 1. Sections 2306.586(a), (b), (c), and (d),
918 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
1019 (a) The purpose of a self-help center is to assist
1120 individuals and families of low income and very low income to
1221 finance, refinance, construct, improve, or maintain a safe,
1322 suitable home and otherwise improve living conditions in the
1423 colonias' designated service area or in another area the department
1524 has determined is suitable.
1625 (b) A self-help center shall set a goal to improve the
1726 living conditions of residents in the colonias designated under
1827 Section 2306.583(b) [2306.583(a)(2)] within a two-year period
1928 after a contract is awarded under this subchapter.
2029 (c) A self-help center may serve individuals and families of
2130 low income and very low income by:
2231 (1) providing assistance in obtaining loans or grants
2332 to build a home;
2433 (2) teaching construction skills necessary to repair
2534 or build a home;
2635 (3) providing model home plans;
2736 (4) operating a program to rent or provide tools for
2837 home construction and improvement for the benefit of property
2938 owners in colonias who are building or repairing a residence or
3039 installing necessary residential infrastructure;
3140 (5) helping to obtain, construct, access, or improve
3241 the service and utility infrastructure designed to service
3342 residences in a colonia, including potable water, wastewater
3443 disposal, drainage, streets, and utilities;
3544 (6) surveying or platting residential property that an
3645 individual purchased without the benefit of a legal survey, plat,
3746 or record;
3847 (7) providing credit and debt counseling related to
3948 home purchase and finance;
4049 (8) applying for grants and loans to provide housing
4150 and other needed community improvements;
4251 (9) providing other services that the self-help
4352 center, with the approval of the department, determines are
4453 necessary to assist colonia residents in improving their [physical]
4554 living conditions, including help in:
4655 (A) obtaining suitable alternative housing
4756 outside of a colonia's area; and
4857 (B) performing the following authorized public
4958 service activities under Title 1 of the Housing and Community
5059 Development Act of 1974 (42 U.S.C. Section 5301 et seq.):
5160 (i) securing employment;
5261 (ii) establishing or expanding a small
5362 business;
5463 (iii) developing professional skills; or
5564 (iv) managing personal finances and
5665 achieving financial literacy;
5766 (10) providing assistance in obtaining loans or grants
5867 to enable an individual or a family to acquire fee simple title to
5968 property that originally was purchased under a contract for a deed,
6069 contract for sale, or other executory contract; and
6170 (11) providing monthly programs to educate
6271 individuals and families on their rights and responsibilities as
6372 property owners.
6473 (d) A self-help center may not provide grants, financing, or
6574 mortgage loan services to purchase, build, rehabilitate, or finance
6675 construction or improvements to a home or otherwise improve living
6776 conditions in a colonia if water service and suitable wastewater
6877 disposal are not available.
6978 SECTION 2. (a) In this section, "colonia" has the meaning
7079 assigned by Section 2306.581, Government Code.
7180 (b) A joint interim committee is established to study
7281 colonias and colonia initiatives in this state.
7382 (c) The joint interim committee is composed of the members
7483 of the standing committees of the legislature with primary
7584 jurisdiction over colonias and colonia issues. The committee
7685 members shall select a presiding officer from among the membership.
7786 (d) In conducting the study under this section, the joint
7887 interim committee shall:
7988 (1) determine the best methods for updating and
8089 maintaining colonia identification systems and for identifying and
8190 classifying colonias in which the highest public health risks
8291 exist;
8392 (2) consider whether colonias should be defined
8493 uniformly across all relevant state agencies and whether that
8594 definition should include essential metrics such as:
8695 (A) economic mobility levels;
8796 (B) poverty levels;
8897 (C) mortality rates;
8998 (D) health professional shortage area scores;
9099 and
91100 (E) the average level of education attained by
92101 colonia residents;
93102 (3) to address the enduring lack of services and
94103 infrastructure in colonias, assess best practices and funding needs
95104 for surveying the services and infrastructure available in, and
96105 demographics of, each colonia;
97106 (4) assess the status of state agency tracking and
98107 reporting of state-funded colonia projects and whether
99108 improvements to the tracking or reporting mechanisms are necessary;
100109 (5) determine and assess any non-infrastructure needs
101110 within colonias and options for this state to address those needs;
102111 and
103112 (6) assess the impact of the COVID-19 pandemic on
104113 colonias and whether additional state services are necessary to
105114 address those impacts.
106115 (e) The joint interim committee has all other powers and
107116 duties provided to a special or select committee by the rules of the
108117 senate and house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301,
109118 Government Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees
110119 on administration.
111120 (f) Not later than September 1, 2022, the joint interim
112121 committee shall prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant
113122 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the
114123 legislature a written report that includes the findings of the
115124 committee under this section, including any legislative
116125 recommendations.
117126 (g) The joint interim committee established under this
118127 section is abolished and this section expires November 1, 2022.
119128 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
120- ______________________________ ______________________________
121- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
122- I certify that H.B. No. 1301 was passed by the House on April
123- 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 79, Nays 49, 1 present, not
124- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
125- No. 1301 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 93, Nays 46,
126- 2 present, not voting.
127- ______________________________
128- Chief Clerk of the House
129- I certify that H.B. No. 1301 was passed by the Senate, with
130- amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays
131- 2.
132- ______________________________
133- Secretary of the Senate
134- APPROVED: __________________
135- Date
136- __________________
137- Governor
129+ * * * * *