Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1301 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            H.B. No. 1301


 AN ACT
 relating to services provided by colonia self-help centers and a
 study on colonias in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2306.586(a), (b), (c), and (d),
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The purpose of a self-help center is to assist
 individuals and families of low income and very low income to
 finance, refinance, construct, improve, or maintain a safe,
 suitable home and otherwise improve living conditions in the
 colonias' designated service area or in another area the department
 has determined is suitable.
 (b)  A self-help center shall set a goal to improve the
 living conditions of residents in the colonias designated under
 Section 2306.583(b) [2306.583(a)(2)] within a two-year period
 after a contract is awarded under this subchapter.
 (c)  A self-help center may serve individuals and families of
 low income and very low income by:
 (1)  providing assistance in obtaining loans or grants
 to build a home;
 (2)  teaching construction skills necessary to repair
 or build a home;
 (3)  providing model home plans;
 (4)  operating a program to rent or provide tools for
 home construction and improvement for the benefit of property
 owners in colonias who are building or repairing a residence or
 installing necessary residential infrastructure;
 (5)  helping to obtain, construct, access, or improve
 the service and utility infrastructure designed to service
 residences in a colonia, including potable water, wastewater
 disposal, drainage, streets, and utilities;
 (6)  surveying or platting residential property that an
 individual purchased without the benefit of a legal survey, plat,
 or record;
 (7)  providing credit and debt counseling related to
 home purchase and finance;
 (8)  applying for grants and loans to provide housing
 and other needed community improvements;
 (9)  providing other services that the self-help
 center, with the approval of the department, determines are
 necessary to assist colonia residents in improving their [physical]
 living conditions, including help in:
 (A)  obtaining suitable alternative housing
 outside of a colonia's area; and
 (B)  performing the following authorized public
 service activities under Title 1 of the Housing and Community
 Development Act of 1974 (42 U.S.C. Section 5301 et seq.):
 (i)  securing employment;
 (ii)  establishing or expanding a small
 business;
 (iii)  developing professional skills; or
 (iv)  managing personal finances and
 achieving financial literacy;
 (10)  providing assistance in obtaining loans or grants
 to enable an individual or a family to acquire fee simple title to
 property that originally was purchased under a contract for a deed,
 contract for sale, or other executory contract; and
 (11)  providing monthly programs to educate
 individuals and families on their rights and responsibilities as
 property owners.
 (d)  A self-help center may not provide grants, financing, or
 mortgage loan services to purchase, build, rehabilitate, or finance
 construction or improvements to a home or otherwise improve living
 conditions in a colonia if water service and suitable wastewater
 disposal are not available.
 SECTION 2.  (a) In this section, "colonia" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 2306.581, Government Code.
 (b)  A joint interim committee is established to study
 colonias and colonia initiatives in this state.
 (c)  The joint interim committee is composed of the members
 of the standing committees of the legislature with primary
 jurisdiction over colonias and colonia issues. The committee
 members shall select a presiding officer from among the membership.
 (d)  In conducting the study under this section, the joint
 interim committee shall:
 (1)  determine the best methods for updating and
 maintaining colonia identification systems and for identifying and
 classifying colonias in which the highest public health risks
 exist;
 (2)  consider whether colonias should be defined
 uniformly across all relevant state agencies and whether that
 definition should include essential metrics such as:
 (A)  economic mobility levels;
 (B)  poverty levels;
 (C)  mortality rates;
 (D)  health professional shortage area scores;
 and
 (E)  the average level of education attained by
 colonia residents;
 (3)  to address the enduring lack of services and
 infrastructure in colonias, assess best practices and funding needs
 for surveying the services and infrastructure available in, and
 demographics of, each colonia;
 (4)  assess the status of state agency tracking and
 reporting of state-funded colonia projects and whether
 improvements to the tracking or reporting mechanisms are necessary;
 (5)  determine and assess any non-infrastructure needs
 within colonias and options for this state to address those needs;
 and
 (6)  assess the impact of the COVID-19 pandemic on
 colonias and whether additional state services are necessary to
 address those impacts.
 (e)  The joint interim committee has all other powers and
 duties provided to a special or select committee by the rules of the
 senate and house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301,
 Government Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees
 on administration.
 (f)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the joint interim
 committee shall prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the
 legislature a written report that includes the findings of the
 committee under this section, including any legislative
 recommendations.
 (g)  The joint interim committee established under this
 section is abolished and this section expires November 1, 2022.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1301 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 79, Nays 49, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1301 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 93, Nays 46,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1301 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays
 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor