Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1307 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021