Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1338 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2021

                    By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1338
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 14, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1338 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation and operations of a health care
 provider participation program by the Harris County Hospital
 District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 299.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 299.004.  EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section
 299.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and operate
 a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2023 [2021].
 (b)  This chapter expires December 31, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 2.  Section 299.151(c), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  If the board requires a mandatory payment authorized
 under this chapter, the board shall set the amount of the mandatory
 payment, subject to the limitations of this chapter. The aggregate
 amount of the mandatory payments required of all paying providers
 in the district may not exceed six [four] percent of the aggregate
 net patient revenue from hospital services provided by all paying
 providers in the district.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *