1 | | - | H.B. No. 1338 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1338 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local |
---|
| 4 | + | Government; May 14, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 14, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1338 By: Menéndez |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the continuation and operations of a health care |
---|
6 | 14 | | provider participation program by the Harris County Hospital |
---|
7 | 15 | | District. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 299.004, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
10 | 18 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 299.004. EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section |
---|
12 | 20 | | 299.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and operate |
---|
13 | 21 | | a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2023 [2021]. |
---|
14 | 22 | | (b) This chapter expires December 31, 2023 [2021]. |
---|
15 | 23 | | SECTION 2. Section 299.151(c), Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
16 | 24 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 25 | | (c) If the board requires a mandatory payment authorized |
---|
18 | 26 | | under this chapter, the board shall set the amount of the mandatory |
---|
19 | 27 | | payment, subject to the limitations of this chapter. The aggregate |
---|
20 | 28 | | amount of the mandatory payments required of all paying providers |
---|
21 | 29 | | in the district may not exceed six [four] percent of the aggregate |
---|
22 | 30 | | net patient revenue from hospital services provided by all paying |
---|
23 | 31 | | providers in the district. |
---|
24 | 32 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
25 | 33 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
26 | 34 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
27 | 35 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
28 | 36 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
29 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
30 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
31 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1338 was passed by the House on April |
---|
32 | | - | 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 99, Nays 47, 2 present, not |
---|
33 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
34 | | - | No. 1338 on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 100, Nays 43, |
---|
35 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
38 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1338 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
39 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
40 | | - | 0. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
43 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Date |
---|
45 | | - | __________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 37 | + | * * * * * |
---|