H.B. No. 1338 AN ACT relating to the continuation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Harris County Hospital District. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 299.004, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 299.004. EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section 299.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and operate a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2023 [2021]. (b) This chapter expires December 31, 2023 [2021]. SECTION 2. Section 299.151(c), Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: (c) If the board requires a mandatory payment authorized under this chapter, the board shall set the amount of the mandatory payment, subject to the limitations of this chapter. The aggregate amount of the mandatory payments required of all paying providers in the district may not exceed six [four] percent of the aggregate net patient revenue from hospital services provided by all paying providers in the district. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1338 was passed by the House on April 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 99, Nays 47, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1338 on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 100, Nays 43, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1338 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor