Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 14, 2021