Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1371 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 04/09/2021

                    BILL ANALYSIS             H.B. 1371     By: Guerra     Agriculture & Livestock     Committee Report (Unamended)             BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE    Federal agents working for the U.S. Customs and Border Protection and the U.S. Department of Agriculture are responsible for agricultural inspections at commercial points of entry. However, an insufficient number of these federal inspectors are available at the state's southern border, which causes exceptional congestion in the stream of commerce entering Texas and a significant loss of income and employment for Texans. H.B. 1371 seeks to help ease congestion in the international trade of agricultural goods by extending the trade agricultural inspection grant program, which aids border inspection efforts.       CRIMINAL JUSTICE IMPACT   It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly create a criminal offense, increase the punishment for an existing criminal offense or category of offenses, or change the eligibility of a person for community supervision, parole, or mandatory supervision.       RULEMAKING AUTHORITY    It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.       ANALYSIS    H.B. 1371 amends the Agriculture Code to postpone the following:          the expiration date of the trade agricultural inspection grant program of the Department of Agriculture (TDA) from September 1, 2021, to September 1, 2025; and           the deadline by which the TDA is required to evaluate the program's performance and submit a related report to the legislature from not later than January 15, 2021, to not later than January 15, 2025.       EFFECTIVE DATE    On passage, or, if the bill does not receive the necessary vote, September 1, 2021.          

BILL ANALYSIS

# BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

 

H.B. 1371
By: Guerra
Agriculture & Livestock
Committee Report (Unamended)

H.B. 1371

By: Guerra

Agriculture & Livestock

Committee Report (Unamended)

 

 

 

BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE    Federal agents working for the U.S. Customs and Border Protection and the U.S. Department of Agriculture are responsible for agricultural inspections at commercial points of entry. However, an insufficient number of these federal inspectors are available at the state's southern border, which causes exceptional congestion in the stream of commerce entering Texas and a significant loss of income and employment for Texans. H.B. 1371 seeks to help ease congestion in the international trade of agricultural goods by extending the trade agricultural inspection grant program, which aids border inspection efforts.
CRIMINAL JUSTICE IMPACT   It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly create a criminal offense, increase the punishment for an existing criminal offense or category of offenses, or change the eligibility of a person for community supervision, parole, or mandatory supervision.
RULEMAKING AUTHORITY    It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.
ANALYSIS    H.B. 1371 amends the Agriculture Code to postpone the following:          the expiration date of the trade agricultural inspection grant program of the Department of Agriculture (TDA) from September 1, 2021, to September 1, 2025; and           the deadline by which the TDA is required to evaluate the program's performance and submit a related report to the legislature from not later than January 15, 2021, to not later than January 15, 2025.
EFFECTIVE DATE    On passage, or, if the bill does not receive the necessary vote, September 1, 2021.

BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE 

 

Federal agents working for the U.S. Customs and Border Protection and the U.S. Department of Agriculture are responsible for agricultural inspections at commercial points of entry. However, an insufficient number of these federal inspectors are available at the state's southern border, which causes exceptional congestion in the stream of commerce entering Texas and a significant loss of income and employment for Texans. H.B. 1371 seeks to help ease congestion in the international trade of agricultural goods by extending the trade agricultural inspection grant program, which aids border inspection efforts.

 

CRIMINAL JUSTICE IMPACT

 

It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly create a criminal offense, increase the punishment for an existing criminal offense or category of offenses, or change the eligibility of a person for community supervision, parole, or mandatory supervision.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY 

 

It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.

 

ANALYSIS 

 

H.B. 1371 amends the Agriculture Code to postpone the following:

         the expiration date of the trade agricultural inspection grant program of the Department of Agriculture (TDA) from September 1, 2021, to September 1, 2025; and 

         the deadline by which the TDA is required to evaluate the program's performance and submit a related report to the legislature from not later than January 15, 2021, to not later than January 15, 2025.

 

EFFECTIVE DATE 

 

On passage, or, if the bill does not receive the necessary vote, September 1, 2021.