1 | | - | H.B. No. 1371 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Guerra, et al. H.B. No. 1371 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Lucio, Blanco, Zaffirini) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 21, 2021; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 3, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 5 | + | Transportation; May 10, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; |
---|
| 7 | + | May 10, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1371 By: Blanco |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the continuation of the Trade Agricultural Inspection |
---|
6 | 15 | | Grant Program. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Sections 12.050(k) and (l), Agriculture Code, |
---|
9 | 18 | | are amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 19 | | (k) Not later than January 15, 2025 [2021], the department |
---|
11 | 20 | | shall evaluate the performance of the program under this section |
---|
12 | 21 | | and submit a report to the legislature. The report must include an |
---|
13 | 22 | | evaluation of agricultural inspections affected by the program, |
---|
14 | 23 | | including the extent to which the program is reducing wait times for |
---|
15 | 24 | | agricultural inspections of vehicles at ports of entry along the |
---|
16 | 25 | | border with the United Mexican States. |
---|
17 | 26 | | (l) Unless continued in existence by the legislature, this |
---|
18 | 27 | | section expires September 1, 2025 [2021]. |
---|
19 | 28 | | SECTION 2. The Department of Agriculture is required to |
---|
20 | 29 | | implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature |
---|
21 | 30 | | appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the |
---|
22 | 31 | | legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that |
---|
23 | 32 | | purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a |
---|
24 | 33 | | provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that |
---|
25 | 34 | | purpose. |
---|
26 | 35 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
27 | 36 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
28 | 37 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
29 | 38 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
30 | 39 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
31 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
32 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
33 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1371 was passed by the House on April |
---|
34 | | - | 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 14, 1 present, not |
---|
35 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
36 | | - | No. 1371 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 119, Nays 21, |
---|
37 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
40 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1371 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
41 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
42 | | - | 0. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
45 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Date |
---|
47 | | - | __________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 40 | + | * * * * * |
---|