Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1371 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2021

                            H.B. No. 1371


 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of the Trade Agricultural Inspection
 Grant Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 12.050(k) and (l), Agriculture Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (k)  Not later than January 15, 2025 [2021], the department
 shall evaluate the performance of the program under this section
 and submit a report to the legislature. The report must include an
 evaluation of agricultural inspections affected by the program,
 including the extent to which the program is reducing wait times for
 agricultural inspections of vehicles at ports of entry along the
 border with the United Mexican States.
 (l)  Unless continued in existence by the legislature, this
 section expires September 1, 2025 [2021].
 SECTION 2.  The Department of Agriculture is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1371 was passed by the House on April
 21, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 135, Nays 14, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1371 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 119, Nays 21,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1371 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor