Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1371 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 05/05/2021

                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   C.S.H.B. 1371     87R19210 MP-D   By: Guerra et al. (Lucio)         Transportation         5/5/2021         Committee Report (Substituted)          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Agriculture inspections are critical to guarding both the agriculture industry and Texas consumers. The coupling of population increase and an upsurge in demand for fresh and healthy produce has put a burden on the agriculture inspection procedures at the Texas-Mexico ports of entry. Moreover, the shortage of agriculture inspectors at the Texas-Mexico border causes congestionsignificant due to the slowdown of commerce and the delayed inspection of perishable produce.   The existing Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Programadministered by the Texas Department of Agriculturereduces wait times for agricultural inspections at ports of entry along the Texas border with the United Mexican States. Through a competitive selection process, the Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program awards grants to an experienced nonprofit organization that provides assistance with agricultural inspections along the Texas-Mexico border.   H.B. 1371 provides continued congestion relief at ports of entry along the Texas-Mexico border by seeking to extend the Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program, created by the Texas Legislature in 2015. Ultimately, this program provides additional agriculture inspectors along the Texas border with the United Mexican States, to reduce wait times for fresh produce.   (Original Author's / Sponsor's Statement of Intent)   C.S.H.B. 1371 amends current law relating to the continuation of the Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Sections 12.050(k) and (l), Agriculture Code, as follows:    (k) Requires the Texas Department of Agriculture (TDA), not later than January 15, 2025, rather than January 15, 2021, to evaluate the performance of the Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program under Section 12.050 (Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program) and submit a report to the legislature.    (l) Provides that, unless continued in existence by the legislature, Section 12.050 expires September 1, 2025, rather than September 1, 2021.   SECTION 2. Provides that TDA is required to implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. Authorizes, but does not require, TDA, if the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that purpose, to implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that purpose.   SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2021.  

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center C.S.H.B. 1371
87R19210 MP-D By: Guerra et al. (Lucio)
 Transportation
 5/5/2021
 Committee Report (Substituted)

Senate Research Center

C.S.H.B. 1371

87R19210 MP-D

By: Guerra et al. (Lucio)

 

Transportation

 

5/5/2021

 

Committee Report (Substituted)

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Agriculture inspections are critical to guarding both the agriculture industry and Texas consumers. The coupling of population increase and an upsurge in demand for fresh and healthy produce has put a burden on the agriculture inspection procedures at the Texas-Mexico ports of entry. Moreover, the shortage of agriculture inspectors at the Texas-Mexico border causes congestionsignificant due to the slowdown of commerce and the delayed inspection of perishable produce.

 

The existing Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Programadministered by the Texas Department of Agriculturereduces wait times for agricultural inspections at ports of entry along the Texas border with the United Mexican States. Through a competitive selection process, the Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program awards grants to an experienced nonprofit organization that provides assistance with agricultural inspections along the Texas-Mexico border.

 

H.B. 1371 provides continued congestion relief at ports of entry along the Texas-Mexico border by seeking to extend the Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program, created by the Texas Legislature in 2015. Ultimately, this program provides additional agriculture inspectors along the Texas border with the United Mexican States, to reduce wait times for fresh produce.

 

(Original Author's / Sponsor's Statement of Intent)

 

C.S.H.B. 1371 amends current law relating to the continuation of the Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Sections 12.050(k) and (l), Agriculture Code, as follows: 

 

(k) Requires the Texas Department of Agriculture (TDA), not later than January 15, 2025, rather than January 15, 2021, to evaluate the performance of the Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program under Section 12.050 (Trade Agricultural Inspection Grant Program) and submit a report to the legislature. 

 

(l) Provides that, unless continued in existence by the legislature, Section 12.050 expires September 1, 2025, rather than September 1, 2021.

 

SECTION 2. Provides that TDA is required to implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. Authorizes, but does not require, TDA, if the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that purpose, to implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that purpose.

 

SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2021.