Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1387 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2021

                    By: Harris, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1387
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 21, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 14, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 1; May 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the storage of firearms and ammunition in the same
 locked location in certain foster homes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.042(e-1), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e-1)  The commission may not prohibit possession of
 lawfully permitted firearms and ammunition in an agency foster
 home.  Minimum standards may be adopted under this section relating
 to safety and proper storage of firearms and ammunition.  The
 minimum standards must allow firearms and ammunition to be [stored
 separately or] stored together in the same locked location [if the
 firearms are stored with a trigger locking device attached to the
 firearms].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *