Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1387 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021