Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1397 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021