Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021