Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1410 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021