Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1410 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1410
1+By: Murphy, Israel (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1410
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2021;
3+ April 19, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
4+ Government; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
6+ May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1410 By: Springer
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the issuance of bonds by certain conservation and
614 reclamation districts.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Section 49.4645, Water Code, is amended by
917 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
1018 follows:
1119 (a) A district all or part of which is located in Bastrop
1220 County, Bexar County, Waller County, Travis County, Williamson
1321 County, Harris County, Galveston County, Brazoria County,
1422 Montgomery County, or Fort Bend County may issue bonds supported by
1523 ad valorem taxes to pay for the development and maintenance of
1624 recreational facilities only if the bonds are authorized by a
1725 majority vote of the voters of the district voting in an election
1826 held for that purpose. Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), the
1927 [The] outstanding principal amount of bonds, notes, and other
2028 obligations issued to finance parks and recreational facilities
2129 supported by ad valorem taxes may not exceed an amount equal to one
2230 percent of the value of the taxable property in the district [or, if
2331 supported by contract taxes under Section 49.108, may not exceed an
2432 amount equal to one percent of the value of the taxable property in
2533 the districts making payments under the contract] as shown by the
2634 tax rolls of the central appraisal district at the time of the
2735 issuance of the bonds, notes, and other obligations [or an amount
2836 greater than the estimated cost provided in the park plan under
2937 Subsection (b), whichever is smaller]. To establish the value of
3038 the taxable property in a district under this section, the district
3139 may use an estimate of the value provided by the central appraisal
3240 district. The district may not issue bonds supported by ad valorem
3341 taxes to pay for the development and maintenance of:
3442 (1) indoor or outdoor swimming pools; or
3543 (2) golf courses.
3644 (a-1) The outstanding principal amount of bonds, notes, and
3745 other obligations issued to finance a recreational facility under
3846 Subsection (a) may exceed an amount equal to one percent but not
3947 three percent of the value of the taxable property in the district
4048 or, if supported by contract taxes under Section 49.108, the value
4149 of the taxable property in the districts making payments under the
4250 contract, if the district has:
4351 (1) a ratio of debt to certified assessed valuation of
4452 10 percent or less;
4553 (2) a credit rating that conforms to commission rules;
4654 (3) a credit enhanced rating on the district's
4755 proposed bond issue that conforms to commission rules; or
4856 (4) a contract with a political subdivision or an
4957 entity acting on behalf of a political subdivision under which the
5058 political subdivision or the entity agrees to provide to the
5159 district taxes or other revenues, as consideration for the
5260 district's development or acquisition of the facility, including a
5361 contract under Section 49.108.
5462 SECTION 2. Section 54.016(e), Water Code, is amended to
5563 read as follows:
5664 (e) A city may provide in its written consent to the
5765 inclusion of land in a district, that the district construct all
5866 facilities to serve the land in accordance with plans and
5967 specifications which have been approved by the city. The city may
6068 also provide in its written consent that the city shall have the
6169 right to inspect all facilities being constructed by a district.
6270 The city's consent to the inclusion of land in the district may also
6371 contain restrictions on the terms and provisions of the district's
6472 bonds and notes issued to provide service to the land and conditions
6573 on the sale of the district's bonds and notes if the restrictions
6674 and conditions do not generally render the bonds and notes of
6775 districts in the city's extraterritorial jurisdiction
6876 unmarketable. The city's consent to the inclusion of land in a
6977 district may restrict the purposes for which a district may issue
7078 bonds to [the] purposes authorized by law for the district [of the
7179 purchase, construction, acquisition, repair, extension and
7280 improvement of land, easements, works, improvements, facilities,
7381 plants, equipment and appliances necessary to:
7482 [(1) provide a water supply for municipal uses,
7583 domestic uses and commercial purposes;
7684 [(2) collect, transport, process, dispose of and
7785 control all domestic, industrial or communal wastes whether in
7886 fluid, solid or composite state; and
7987 [(3) gather, conduct, divert and control local storm
8088 water or other local harmful excesses of water in the district and
8189 the payment of organization expenses, operation expenses during
8290 construction and interest during construction].
8391 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act to Section
8492 54.016(e), Water Code, does not affect the terms of a city's
8593 resolution or ordinance adopted before the effective date of this
8694 Act that constitutes a valid, written consent under Section 54.016
8795 of that code for land that was included in a district prior to the
8896 effective date of this Act.
8997 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
9098 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
9199 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
92100 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
93101 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
94- ______________________________ ______________________________
95- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
96- I certify that H.B. No. 1410 was passed by the House on April
97- 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 14, 1 present, not
98- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
99- No. 1410 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 17,
100- 1 present, not voting.
101- ______________________________
102- Chief Clerk of the House
103- I certify that H.B. No. 1410 was passed by the Senate, with
104- amendments, on May 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
105- 2.
106- ______________________________
107- Secretary of the Senate
108- APPROVED: __________________
109- Date
110- __________________
111- Governor
102+ * * * * *