Senate | 05/14/2021 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Record vote RV#636 | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Record vote RV#584 | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Amended 1-Sanford | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Vote reconsidered | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Record vote RV#574 | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Failed to pass to engrossment | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(4) | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Filed |