Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1433 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021