Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021