Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1443 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 25, 2021