04/30/2021 | Effective on 1/1/22 | |||
04/30/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
04/21/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Record vote RV#94 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 01/28/2021 | Filed |